Financial history STAPENHILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025180
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.29k £7.13k £5.52k £618 £2.66k
Total expenditure £6.83k £7.01k £6.60k £611 £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A