Trustees GREATER LONDON NORTH EAST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1025705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Stuart Stride | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julien Alexander Rawle | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jude John Adigwe | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fix | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
William John Parry | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lee Clark | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
DOREEN NEUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM WETHERELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL DANVERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.