Financial history 21 CLUB LUTON

Charity number: 1026900
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.38k £6.96k £5.44k £1.73k £1.00k
Total expenditure £4.35k £4.99k £4.58k £1.11k £1.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A