Accounts and annual returns CO OPEPYS COMMUNITY ARTS PROJECT

Charity number: 1027133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 February 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required