LANCASHIRE COUNTY YOUTH CRICKET CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1027172
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2006 30/11/2007 30/11/2008 30/11/2009 30/11/2010
Total gross income £103.76k £194.06k £40.21k £40.24k £43.19k
Total expenditure £16.82k £35.04k £325.92k £72.38k £56.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A