WHITE ROCK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 July 2016 On time Download