Financial history WHITE ROCK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £96.43k £80.95k £83.25k £85.52k £109.33k
Total expenditure £88.81k £86.70k £82.88k £85.20k £98.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A