Financial history PURBECK RADAR MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1027390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.00k £437 £221 £20 £30
Total expenditure £733 £0 £193 £75 £126
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A