Norfolk and Norwich SEND Association

Charity number: 1027466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.35m £1.34m £1.42m £1.26m £1.41m
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.32m £1.52m £1.23m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £603.51k £731.40k £712.58k £668.50k £715.70k
Income from government grants £0 £28.98k £28.98k £49.25k £51.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £101.80k £87.98k £26.22k £75.49k £346.49k
Income - Other trading activities £451.97k £401.00k £345.88k £311.63k £325.68k
Income - Charitable activities £800.74k £746.39k £843.44k £875.13k £732.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £216 £254 £348 £581 £748
Income - Other £0 £106.84k £209.07k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £14.59k £50.00k £0 £38.93k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £998.45k £868.74k £1.10m £908.16k £919.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds £323.26k £450.52k £421.18k £324.28k £336.99k
Expenditure - Governance £5.05k £6.30k £5.94k £5.58k £4.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 -£1.09k £0 £0 £0