Norfolk and Norwich SEND Association

Charity number: 1027466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Mitchell Trustee 19 August 2019 None on record
John Sorrell Trustee 18 June 2015 None on record
GILLIAN DOY Trustee None on record
Diana Keyzor Trustee 17 December 2020 None on record
DAVID BRIEF Trustee 08 August 2018
ST MARTINS HOUSING TRUST Received: 15 days late
Margaret Smith Trustee 07 October 2015 None on record