MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1027652
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £157.60k £144.38k £150.15k £153.27k £153.76k
Total expenditure £150.41k £176.72k £160.09k £210.67k £245.91k