MOUNTSORREL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1027652
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Ann Tyman Trustee
MOUNTSORREL EDUCATIONAL FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Roger Verdun Carroll Trustee 26 July 2017
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Rev Colin Ernst Resch Trustee 21 January 2015
MOUNTSORREL EDUCATIONAL FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Paul Albert Harris Trustee
MOUNTSORREL WAR MEMORIALS TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is 1822 days late
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Frederick Lewis Newitt Trustee
MOUNTSORREL EDUCATIONAL FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
George Overton Chair 30 September 2011
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Daisy Eng Kim Chan Trustee 25 October 2017
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Trevor Rigley Trustee 01 August 2018
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Christopher William Berry Trustee 26 July 2017
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Penelope Jane Maguire Trustee 30 April 2014
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
MR GEOFF WAINWRIGHT Trustee 30 September 2011
LOUGHBOROUGH METHODIST CIRCUIT Charity reporting is up to date
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Jayne Elizabeth Ilett Trustee 26 July 2017
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Elizabeth Mary Blackshaw Trustee 09 December 2020
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Benjamin Evan Davies Trustee 18 January 2017
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Stephen Roy Haywood Trustee
MOUNTSORREL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date