BLACKSTONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1027789
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2021 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 April 2021 538 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 April 2021 900 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required