BLACKSTONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1027789
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £32.34k £3.96k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £22.65k £3.12k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A