Financial history SPARKLERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £69.69k £65.16k £72.08k £71.14k £75.38k
Total expenditure £61.93k £64.11k £64.65k £66.30k £93.30k
Income from government contracts £65.86k N/A N/A N/A £74.98k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A