WESTBURY AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1028041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.95k £6.12k £6.20k £4.01k £3.00k
Total expenditure £6.41k £6.22k £6.00k £5.42k £5.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A