Accounts and annual returns ST PETERS PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 June 2022 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 January 2021 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 January 2021 709 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required