Financial history BAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1028789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £9.75k £9.99k £9.86k £9.88k £7.20k
Total expenditure £9.24k £5.46k £9.26k £9.43k £9.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A