Financial history WINCANTON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1029009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £31.36k £28.77k £24.81k £20.21k £6.75k
Total expenditure £31.09k £27.37k £27.76k £19.93k £6.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A N/A N/A