Financial history PAPPLEWICK AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029178
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.34k £11.68k £13.44k £10.58k £0
Total expenditure £11.01k £12.04k £11.74k £11.35k £1.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A