STROUD COURT COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1029448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.46m £2.53m £2.74m £2.82m £3.37m
Total expenditure £2.52m £2.62m £2.76m £2.78m £2.88m
Income from government contracts £2.12m £2.23m £2.43m £2.53m £2.75m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £245.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £99.09k £66.43k £39.06k £23.05k £98.55k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.45m £2.68m £2.77m £3.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.44k £8.35k £4.34k £15.16k £1.12k
Income - Other £1.35k £6.84k £12.05k £9.84k £1.42k
Income - Legacies £50.75k £0 £20.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.48m £2.58m £2.74m £2.76m £2.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.67k £33.35k £25.23k £26.93k £26.93k
Expenditure - Governance £8.00k £8.00k £8.00k £8.40k £9.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0