EMMANUEL SCHOOL EXETER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1030485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £17.90k £23.80k £21.18k £16.59k £8.81k
Total expenditure £16.20k £23.02k £26.82k £23.59k £8.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A