Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LOCKS HEATH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1030518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.43k £2.51k £2.31k £1.37k £2.32k
Total expenditure £1.21k £2.25k £2.03k £1.09k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A