Financial history FORMBY WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1030886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £9.61k £6.15k £10.19k £6.20k £5.71k
Total expenditure £5.06k £5.35k £6.03k £1.74k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A