INNER WHEEL CLUB OF TAVISTOCK BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1032079
Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 September 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 28 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required