AYOT ST LAWRENCE VILLAGE LAND TRUST

Charity number: 1032337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY TAYLOR Trustee 30 April 2019
AYOT ST. LAWRENCE SOCIETY Received: On time
Susan Heathcote Trustee 10 April 2013 None on record
Robert Lucas Trustee 16 April 2007 None on record
Neil Robinson Chair 20 April 2015
AYOT ST. LAWRENCE SOCIETY Received: On time
Dr Malcolm Aldridge Trustee 07 April 1993
THE AMATEUR ENTOMOLOGISTS' SOCIETY Received: On time
AYOT ST. LAWRENCE SOCIETY Received: On time
OLIVE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time