BASSINGHAM PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £158.24k £163.79k £183.81k £0 £0
Total expenditure £140.06k £158.49k £203.82k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £74.15k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.56k £0 £89.49k N/A N/A