Financial history FOXHOLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £32.32k £1.14k £20 £0 £0
Total expenditure £29.06k £4.40k £672 £383 £0
Income from government contracts £25.77k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A