MORICE TOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034721
Charity reporting is overdue by 892 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 526 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 526 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 892 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 892 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 July 2019 388 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 October 2017 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required