MORICE TOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034721
Charity reporting is overdue by 893 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £10 £2.14k £1.72k £1.55k £1.55k
Total expenditure £176 £819 £862 £730 £730
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A