THE ANVIL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1034961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Hayward Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
ANDREW JOHN FINNEY Trustee 21 September 2012 None on record
Laura Bryony Bell Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
David William Courtenay Whelton OBE HonRCM Trustee 24 October 2017
THREE CHOIRS FESTIVAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE THREE CHOIRS FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION LTD Received: On time
THE WIMBLEDON CONCERT HALL Received: On time
Abigail Helen Bowden Trustee 13 September 2017 None on record
Clare Kinnear Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
David Chatten-Smith Trustee 16 January 2018
BASINGSTOKE AND DISTRICT DISABILITY FORUM Received: On time
hhcr, basingstoke community radio Received: On time
Sara Michelle Catley Trustee 24 October 2017 None on record