ST MARGARET'S PLAYGROUP (ORFORD)

Charity number: 1035109
Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 March 2021 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 April 2021 282 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 March 2021 638 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 847 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 November 2018 129 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 September 2017 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1577 days