Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN WELFARE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1035387
Charity reporting is overdue by 1539 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 78 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 78 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 443 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 443 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 808 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 808 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1173 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1173 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1539 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1539 days