AFRICAN WELFARE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1035387
Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2006 01/04/2007 01/04/2008 01/04/2009 01/04/2010
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £3.95k £7.40k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £3.90k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A