Financial history 25TH PETERBOROUGH (PASTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1035793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.45k £7.24k £17.16k £8.20k £22.57k
Total expenditure £9.18k £22.13k £9.98k £12.83k £6.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A £20.24k