THE RAVC WELFARE & BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1037208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 November 2016 On time Download