HARPFIELDS PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 23 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 10 January 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2016 Not Required