HARPFIELDS PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 21/09/2016 31/08/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020
Total gross income £3.53k £3.07k £2.51k £1.43k £6.04k
Total expenditure £1.68k £1.45k £1.56k £3.25k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A