Governing document WEYBRIDGE MALE VOICE CHOIR
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUGUST 1977 AS AMENDED 25 AUGUST 1992, 30 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 26 APRIL 1994 ADOPTED 31 OCT 2017 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 03 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
A)THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY PUBLIC PERFORMANCE B)TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE CHOIR COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,WEYBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.