Trustees WEYBRIDGE MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity number: 1038624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WILSON | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMAS | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WILSON | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NICHOLAS ABSON | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RONALD REED | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
STAVELEY FERGUSON | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLIN GROVES | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GARDINER | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.