RAVENFIELD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1038875
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Annual return 31 July 2015 24 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 24 May 2016 On time