Financial history 1ST BISHOPSTON BRISTOL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £36.92k £40.25k £49.75k £49.75k £31.02k
Total expenditure £32.02k £38.19k £40.72k £40.72k £16.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.43k