Trustees 1ST BISHOPSTON BRISTOL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lauren Hodgkinson Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Steven Nigel Moysey Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Julie Johnson Trustee 07 June 2019
None on record
Michelle Henry-Cohen Trustee 10 January 2019
None on record
Ruth Wainwright Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Chris Brooker Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Nicola Thomas Trustee 27 June 2017
None on record
Elinor Davies Trustee 09 May 2014
None on record
Tom Jackson Trustee 09 May 2014
None on record
CHRIS HARTLEY Trustee 23 June 2013
None on record