Trustees THE DITTONS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUZAN BAKER Chair
None on record
Louise O'Gorman Trustee 18 November 2018
None on record
Antony Roland Edwards Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Melanie Uzunoglu Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Fiona Ball Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
KATE BACK Trustee 01 March 2013
None on record
Paul Bartlett Trustee 31 January 2013
None on record
Julia Hawkins Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Allen Widdowson Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
NORMAN GOLDSMITH Trustee
None on record
Diana Goodhugh Trustee
None on record
DAVID COOPER Trustee
None on record
STUART JACK Trustee
None on record