ALL SAINTS LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 September 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2019 21 June 2021 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2017 19 November 2018 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2016 Not Required