ALL SAINTS LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/09/2016 04/09/2017 04/09/2018 04/09/2019 04/09/2020
Total gross income £18.93k £11.64k £12.50k £6.74k £3.82k
Total expenditure £17.61k £14.70k £11.28k £9.64k £325
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A