Crossways PTA

Charity number: 1039437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required