Crossways PTA

Charity number: 1039437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.11k £5.08k £10.77k £9.71k £6.16k
Total expenditure £1.84k £8.01k £10.63k £12.64k £11.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A