BENGALI WORKERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039551
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download