CRESCENT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1039644
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/10/2016 07/10/2017 07/10/2018 07/10/2019 07/10/2020
Total gross income £51.00k £47.69k £62.04k £52.77k £35.88k
Total expenditure £56.16k £49.16k £52.08k £44.35k £49.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £17.85k £43.68k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.96k £0 N/A N/A N/A